House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 125527 engrossed amendment (replaces 210753, 710871)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 210753 adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 710871 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 32 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (285008)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/07/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/13/23, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|