Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Filed |