House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|