House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in returning Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Requested House to recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (470345)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 470345 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 32 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (500158)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/25/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 15 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/18/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/09/24, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/13/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|