Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024