Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 855
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 855
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 01/24/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|