Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 12/13/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|