Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0320 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024