03/22/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-13 | |||
03/21/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
03/12/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Substituted for CS/HB 7041 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/18/24 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/11/24, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/15/2023 | Filed |