Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0328 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 28, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024