Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | CS by Transportation read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Filed |