Senate | 02/14/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 303 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Substituted CS/HB 303 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/09/24, 2:30 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Now in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Referred to Agriculture; Regulated Industries; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Filed |