Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | CS by Health Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Filed |