Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Filed |