Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024