Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1329
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1329
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (133770)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/24/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|