Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Filed |