Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Filed |