Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0458 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024