Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Filed |