Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0496 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024