Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0514 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 18, 2024