Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/20/2023 | Filed |