Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024