Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0564 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024