Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Filed |