Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0574 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 6, 2024