Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 601
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted HB 601
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|