Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0590 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024