Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024