Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 481
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 481
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|