Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0616 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024