Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 937
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted HB 937
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|