Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0656 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024