Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024