|
04/03/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-48
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (255056, 733260)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/22/24, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|