Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0678 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 17, 2024