Senate | 02/21/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 487 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Substituted CS/HB 487 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Filed |