Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Filed |