Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0700 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/12/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Criminal Justice  
 
BILL: SB 700 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Gruters 
SUBJECT:  Controlled Substances 
DATE: January 12, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Vaughan Stokes CJ Pre-meeting 
2.     JU  
3.     RC  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 700 amends s. 893.03, F.S., to except from the list of Schedule 1 controlled substances, 
xylazine animal drug products that are approved by the United States Food and Drug 
Administration (FDA) for certain purposes. The manufacture, importation, distribution, 
prescribing, or sale for human use is not subject to this exception. 
 
The term “xylazine” means the nonopioid tranquilizer methyl benzene compound frequently 
used in veterinary medicine as an emetic and sedative with analgesic and muscle relaxant 
properties.
1
 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
II. Present Situation: 
Currently, s. 893.03(1)(c)37, F.S., lists xylazine as a Schedule I drug. A substance in Schedule I 
has a high potential for abuse and has no currently accepted medical use in treatment in the 
United States and in its use under medical supervision does not meet accepted safety standards.
2
 
Xylazine is also known as “tranq”
3
 and is a central nervous system depressant that can cause 
drowsiness, amnesia, slow breathing, low heart rate and blood pressure. Xylazine is FDA 
approved for use in animals as a sedative and pain reliever, it is not safe for use in humans and it 
                                                
1
 15 U.S.C. 278u. 
2
 Section 893.03(1), F.S. 
3
 National Library of Medicine, Increasing presence of xylazine in heroin and/or fentanyl deaths, Philadelphia, 
Pennsylvania, 2010–2019, Johnson J, Pizzicato L, Johnson C, Viner K., August 2021, available at Increasing presence of 
xylazine in heroin and/or fentanyl deaths, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, 2010-2019 - PubMed (nih.gov) (last visited 
January 11, 2024). 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 700   	Page 2 
 
is not known if the exposure can be reversed by naloxone.
4
 Research has shown xylazine is often 
added to illicit opioids, including fentanyl, and people report using xylazine-containing fentanyl 
to lengthen its euphoric effects.
5
 
 
Florida Controlled Substance Schedules 
Section 893.03, F.S., classifies controlled substances into five categories or classifications, 
known as schedules. The schedules regulate the manufacture, distribution, preparation, and 
dispensing of substances listed in the schedules. The most important factors in determining 
which schedule may apply to a substance are the “potential for abuse”
6
 of the substance and 
whether there is a currently accepted medical use for the substance. The controlled substance 
schedules are described as follows: 
 Schedule I substances (s. 893.03(1), F.S.) have a high potential for abuse and no currently 
accepted medical use in treatment in the United States. Use of these substances under 
medical supervision does not meet accepted safety standards. 
 Schedule II substances (s. 893.03(2), F.S.) have a high potential for abuse and a currently 
accepted but severely restricted medical use in treatment in the United States. Abuse of these 
substances may lead to severe psychological or physical dependence. 
 Schedule III substances (s. 893.03(3), F.S.) have a potential for abuse less than the Schedule I 
and Schedule II substances and a currently accepted medical use in treatment in the United 
States. Abuse of these substances may lead to moderate or low physical dependence or high 
psychological dependence. Abuse of anabolic steroids may lead to physical damage. 
 Schedule IV substances (s. 893.03(4), F.S.) have a low potential for abuse relative to 
Schedule III substances and a currently accepted medical use in treatment in the United 
States. Abuse of these substances may lead to limited physical or psychological dependence 
relative to Schedule III substances. 
 Schedule V substances (s. 893.03(5), F.S.) have a low potential for abuse relative to Schedule 
IV substances and a currently accepted medical use in treatment in the United States. Abuse 
of these substances may lead to limited physical or psychological dependence relative to 
Schedule IV substances. 
 
Controlled Substance Analog 
A “controlled substance analog” is defined in s. 893.0356(2)(a), F.S., as a substance which, due 
to its chemical structure and potential for abuse, meets the following criteria: 
 The substance is substantially similar to that of a controlled substance listed in Schedule I; or 
 Schedule II of s. 893.03, F.S.; and 
 The substance has a stimulant, depressant, or hallucinogenic effect on the central nervous 
system or is represented or intended to have a stimulant, depressant, or hallucinogenic effect 
                                                
4
 U.S. Food and Drug Administration, FDA alerts health care professionals of risks to patients exposed to xylazine in illicit 
drugs, November 8, 2022, available at https://www.fda.gov/drugs/drug-safety-and-availability/fda-alerts-health-care-
professionals-risks-patients-exposed-xylazine-illicit-drugs (last visited January 11, 2024). 
5
 National Institute on Drug Abuse, Xylazine Research Topics, available at https://nida.nih.gov/research-topics/xylazine (last 
visited on January 8, 2024). 
6
 Section 893.035(3)(a), F.S., defines “potential for abuse” as a substance that has properties as a central nervous system 
stimulant or depressant or a hallucinogen that create a substantial likelihood of the substance being: used in amounts that 
create a hazard to the user’s health or the safety of the community; diverted from legal channels and distributed through 
illegal channels; or taken on the user’s own initiative rather than on the basis of professional medical advice.  BILL: SB 700   	Page 3 
 
on the central nervous system substantially similar to or greater than that of a controlled 
substance listed in Schedule I or Schedule II of s. 893.03, F.S. 
 
Controlled Substance Offenses Under ss. 893.13 and 893.135, F.S. 
Section 893.13, F.S., in part, punishes unlawful possession, sale, purchase, manufacture, and 
delivery of a controlled substance.
7
 The penalty for violating s. 893.13, F.S., generally depends 
on the act committed, the substance and quantity of the substance involved, and the location in 
which the violation occurred. 
 
Drug trafficking, which is punished in s. 893.135, F.S., consists of knowingly selling, 
purchasing, manufacturing, delivering, or bringing into this state (importation), or knowingly 
being in actual or constructive possession of, certain Schedule I or Schedule II controlled 
substances in a statutorily-specified quantity. The statute only applies to a limited number of 
such controlled substances, and the controlled substances involved in the trafficking must meet a 
specified weight or quantity threshold. 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill amends s. 893.03, F.S., to except from the list of Schedule 1 controlled substances 
xylazine animal drug products that are approved by the United States Food and Drug 
Administration and the use of which conforms to the approved application or is authorized under 
federal law. The manufacture, importation, distribution, prescribing, or sale of xylazine for 
human use is not subject to this exception. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
                                                
7
 See e.g., s. 893.13(1)(a) and (b) and (6), F.S.  BILL: SB 700   	Page 4 
 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None identified. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The Legislature’s Office of Economic and Demographic Research (EDR) and the 
Criminal Justice Impact Conference, which provides the final, official estimate of the 
prison bed impact, if any, of legislation, has not yet reviewed the bill. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 893.03 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.