Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0732 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024