Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 405
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 405
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time 585
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/24/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|