Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 429
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 429
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|