Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0776 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 6, 2024