Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/15/2023 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Filed |