Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 775
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 775
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|