Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0804 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024