Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0818 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024