Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0830 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 19, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024