|
04/08/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-60
|
|
|
|
04/05/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|